THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 2:48:53 AM
Bell, Mary Jane
CPSO#:
50133
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jun 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jun 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite MI - 401
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4580
Fax: (416) 480-4233
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Rheumatology |
Effective:23 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:18 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARY JANE BELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELL is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1979 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1987 |