THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 22:52:00 PM
Blair, Cynthia Lyn
CPSO#:
50122
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
16 Nov 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Beard, Cynthia Lyn (used until: 02 Oct 1983 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2525 Old Bronte Road, Suite 350
Oakville ON L6M 4J2
Phone: (905) 842-2295
Fax: (905) 829-0779
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Dec 1992 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 1983 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Nov 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 16 Nov 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 12 Mar 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee |
Effective: 20 Jun 2011 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Discipline Committee |
Effective: 20 Jun 2011 |
|
Active |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 20 Jun 2011
Summary:
On June 20, 2011, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Cynthia Lyn Blair has committed an act of professional misconduct, in that she has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, and in that she has contravened a term, condition or limitation on her certificate of registration. The Committee also found that Dr. Cynthia Lyn Blair is incompetent.
Dr. Blair failed to maintain the standard of practice in her care and treatment of 27 liposuction patients in that: she failed to employ appropriate sterile technique; her facility is inadequate for the performance of invasive surgical procedures (i.e. liposuction); her pre-operative care of liposuction patients is substandard; her intra-operative care of liposuction patients is substandard; her discharge of patients is substandard; and her charting is substandard. Dr. Blair also failed to maintain the standard of practice in her charting of patients for whom she administered botox and other injectables.
Dr. Blair contravened a term, condition or limitation on her certificate of registration by practising in an area of medicine in which she is not educated and experienced.
The Committee also found that Dr. Blair is incompetent with respect to liposuction.
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
1. Dr. Blair attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
2. The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Blair's certificate of registration:
a. Dr. Blair shall be prohibited from performing or engaging in the performance of liposuction procedures;
b. At her own expense, Dr. Blair shall retain a College approved preceptor on record keeping in relation to her cosmetic practice for a period of six months, and who has signed an undertaking in the form attached [to the Order] as Schedule "A" (the "Cosmetic Practice Preceptor"). The Cosmetic Practice Preceptor shall meet with Dr. Blair monthly and review a minimum of 10 randomly chosen patient records per month with reports to the College every two months. Dr. Blair will abide at her own expense by all recommendations of the Cosmetic Practice Preceptor with respect to her medical record keeping, including with respect to any charting improvements; and
c. At her own expense, Dr. Blair shall retain a College approved preceptor for her family practice for a period of six months, and who has signed an undertaking in the form attached [to the Order] as Schedule "B" (the "Family Practice Preceptor"). The Family Practice Preceptor shall meet with Dr. Blair monthly and review a minimum of 10 patient records per month with reports to the College every two months.
3. Dr. Blair shall within 30 days pay the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of $30,000.00.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 31-June 3, June 20-22, 2011