THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 13:23:56 PM
Bassett, Anne Susan
CPSO#:
50120
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jul 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jul 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Clinical Genetics Research Program
Centre for Addiction
and Mental Health
33 Russell Street
Toronto ON M5S 2S1
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 32731
Fax: (416) 535-7199
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Brunswick
Prince Edward Island
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,- Russell Street Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:01 Jun 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANNE SUSAN BASSETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASSETT is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1982 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jun 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 1987 |