THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 23:15:01 PM
Bass, Juan
CPSO#:
50119
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Apr 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Apr 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: Colegio Mayor De Ntra Sra Del Rosario, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
7750 Bayview Ave
Shouldice Hospital
Thornhill ON L3T 4A3
Phone: (905) 889-1125
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Juan Bass Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 17 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Shouldice Hospital Ltd. |
Markham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:20 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric General Surgery |
Effective:16 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JUAN BASS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1980 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Apr 1987 |