THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:49:14 AM
Aziz, Muhammed Shahid
CPSO#:
50103
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Apr 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Apr 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
127 Westmore Drive
Unit # 103
Etobicoke ON M9V3Y6
Phone: 416 749 3933
Fax: 416 749 3936
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:17 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MUHAMMED SHAHID AZIZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZIZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 1982 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Apr 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Apr 1997 |