THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 10:26:44 AM
Awuku, Mark Addi
CPSO#:
50101
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Mar 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Mar 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Akan, English
Education: Univ of Ghana, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Mark Awuku Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 18 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:For medical record requests, contact Dr. Catherine Bshouty at 519-254-7979.
Date Received: 05 Dec 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:22 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARK ADDI AWUKU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AWUKU is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1980 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Mar 1988 |