THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:45:25 PM
Amba, Sudhir
CPSO#:
50075
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Sep 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of Delhi, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
121 Wellington Street West
Barrie ON L4N 1L2
Phone: (705) 722-5333
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:24 Jun 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:26 May 2023 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUDHIR AMBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMBA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - Rheumatology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 15 Sep 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
CF - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 1982 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1987 |