THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 14:16:42 PM
Alpert, Brian
CPSO#:
50072
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jan 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jan 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Jacobs Pain Centre
Suite 102
8920 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON L3R 9W9
Phone: (905) 305-9484
Fax: (905) 305-7381
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:21 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRIAN ALPERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALPERT is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1982 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jun 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Apr 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 Aug 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 1995 |