THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 9:39:49 AM
Alam, Zeenat Yasmin
CPSO#:
50061
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
19 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Dec 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English, Urdu
Education: Dacca Medical College, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Z. Y. Alam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 18 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:13 Jun 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 1982 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Mar 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Dec 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 19 Jul 2021 |