THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 3:07:30 AM
Abraham, Eapen George
CPSO#:
50045
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Aug 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Aug 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Malayalam
Education: University of Bombay, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
115 MacLean Place
Welland ON L3B 5X9
Phone: (905) 788-0960
Fax: (905) 788-9278
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: E. George Abraham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 17 2024
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital |
Dunnville |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EAPEN GEORGE ABRAHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABRAHAM is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1979 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 1984 |