THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 20:43:11 PM
Abara, Okechukwu Emmanuel
CPSO#:
50040
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Apr 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
22 Feb 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Ibo
Education: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
9755 Bathurst Street
Richmond Hill ON L4C 3X5
Phone: (905) 883-3666
Fax: (905) 883-0080
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nigeria
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) |
Hearst |
Kirkland and District Hospital |
Kirkland Lake |
Sensenbrenner Hospital |
Kapuskasing |
Smooth Rock Falls Hospital |
Smooth Rock Falls |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:16 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
CF - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Apr 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1989 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Feb 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 22 Feb 2011 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
member |
Effective: 22 Feb 2011 |
|
Active |