THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 7:11:08 AM
Butters, David Ernest
CPSO#:
50028
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jan 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
16 Nov 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. David Butters Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 20 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may put their request in writing to Dr. Butters at:
60 Arnold Avenue
Thornhill ON L4J 1B3.
Date Received: 10 Aug 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:26 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 27 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Nov 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Nov 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jan 2022 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: November 16, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. David Ernest Butters to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 16, 2017:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Butters engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in his urological practice. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Butters must not perform any surgical or operative procedures except vasectomies.
Dr. Butters shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows: “Dr. Butters must not perform any surgical or operative procedures except vasectomies. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca”.