THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 7:05:54 AM
Glancy, Graham David
CPSO#:
50019
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 1981
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jul 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Manchester Medical School, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3 - 4th Floor - Rm 471
1001 Queen St W
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Phone: 416 236 5602
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:04 Jun 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GRAHAM DAVID GLANCY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLANCY is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1989 |