THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 10:39:15 AM
Szul, John Michael
CPSO#:
46641
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member - CPSO Staff as of
08 Sep 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Apr 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ukrainian Canadian Care Centre
60 Richview Rd
Toronto ON M9A 5E4
Toronto ON M5G 2E2
Phone: 416-243-7653
Fax: 4162437452
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1978 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN MICHAEL SZUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZUL is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1974 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Jun 1975 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Apr 1987 |