THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 21:05:41 PM
Stern, Jerry
CPSO#:
46302
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
22 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 Dec 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. J. Stern Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:840 McConnell Ave
Cornwall, ON K6H 5S5
Date Received: 22 Jun 2017
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1975 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jun 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Dec 1989 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Dec 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Dec 1989 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 22 Jun 2017 |