THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 1:44:01 AM
Prabhu, Vijayalaxmi
CPSO#:
46011
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jan 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jan 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Mysore University, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 17000 Stn Forces
Canadian Forces Health Services Cen
Kingston ON K7K 7B4
Phone: 613 541 5010.
Electoral District: 06
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:26 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VIJAYALAXMI PRABHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRABHU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1974 to 14 Jun 1975
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1976 to 30 Jun 1977
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1974 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jan 1998 |