THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 10:55:42 AM
Agboola, Olusegun Oluyinka
CPSO#:
45882
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Mar 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Yoruba
Education: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Olusegun Agboola Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 6 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:26 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1973 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1975 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Mar 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Oct 1989 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jan 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Mar 1991 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |