THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 2:46:44 AM
Schiff, Michael Dov
CPSO#:
45737
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
06 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
450-5 Fairview Mall Dr
North York ON M2J 2Z1
Phone: (416) 322-7517
Fax: (416) 489-8053
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1976 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Jun 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Nov 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jan 2015 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 05 Feb 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jan 2015 |
|
Active |