THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 9:23:35 AM
Mitton, Gregory Donald
CPSO#:
45701
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Nov 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Nov 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
Department of Radiology
400 BROAD STREET
Dunnville ON N1A 2P7
Phone: (905) 774-7431 Ext. 1221
Fax: (905) 774-7914
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
USA - California
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital |
Dunnville |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:20 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GREGORY DONALD MITTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITTON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 12 Jan 1987 to 06 Mar 1987
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1977 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Jun 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 1987 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Mar 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 1998 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Nov 2004 |