THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 4:32:21 AM
McDonagh, Thomas Henry Michael
CPSO#:
44825
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Mar 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Mar 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
024 -279 Wharncliffe Rd N
London ON N6H 2C2
Phone: (519) 872-8151
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1988 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. THOMAS HENRY MICHAEL MCDONAGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDONAGH is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1978 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Mar 1986 |