THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 14:10:46 PM
Alderdice, Catherine Ann
CPSO#:
44819
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
21 Apr 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jul 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Catherine Alderdice, Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 4 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:St Joseph's Health Centre, Medical Records Dept
100 Westmount Rd, Guelph, Ontario N1H 5H8
Date Received: 21 Apr 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Rheumatology |
Effective:09 Dec 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 3 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 4 - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1980 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 Apr 2021 |