THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 22:27:13 PM
Rodrigues, Paulo Roberto Dornelles
CPSO#:
44031
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
27 Jan 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Federal University of Rio Grande Do Sul, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: P.R.D. Rodrigues Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 8 2014
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Site
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Date Received: 24 Apr 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic and Therapeutic Radiology |
Effective:14 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1976 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1979 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jan 1986 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2014 |