THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 0:41:20 AM
Ra, Paul Mu-Ung
CPSO#:
44013
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Nov 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Nov 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Korean
Education: Chonnam National University, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Pathology
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 990-9510
Fax: (519) 254-6861
Electoral District: 01
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Paul Ra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 17 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:03 Dec 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAUL MU-UNG RA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1979 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Nov 1985 |