THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:23:18 AM
Hodson, David Ian
CPSO#:
43969
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 Apr 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Oxford Medical Sciences Di, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: D. Ian Hodson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 27 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:25 Nov 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 1980 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Apr 1989 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |