THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 1:09:11 AM
Dvorkin, Gary Steven
CPSO#:
43781
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Oct 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Oct 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1111 ghyslain
Hawkesbury ON K6A 3E5
Phone: 613-632-1111
Fax: 613-636-6175
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital |
Hawkesbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:26 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GARY STEVEN DVORKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DVORKIN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1979 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1981 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Oct 1992 |