THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 23:00:39 PM
Escallon, Jaime Mainwaring
CPSO#:
43775
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Sep 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jan 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Colegio Mayor De Ntra Sra Del Rosario, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of General Surgery
600 University Avenue Suite 1266
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5163
Fax: (416) 586-8847
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Jaime Escallon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Colombia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:24 Nov 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAIME MAINWARING ESCALLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ESCALLON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1976 to 30 Jun 1977
Resident 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 26 Jun 1979
Resident 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 4 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1975 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 2008 |