THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 8:58:03 AM
Patel, Hasmukh Gokalbhai
CPSO#:
43686
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jun 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Feb 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Swahili
Education: University of Bombay, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1030 Ouellette Avenue,
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4421
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:21 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HASMUKH GOKALBHAI PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1975 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1980 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Apr 1986 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Apr 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Feb 1995 |