THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 6:36:34 AM
Ainsworth, Peter Joseph
CPSO#:
43591
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Sep 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:London Health Sciences Centre,
800 Comissioner's Rd E
London N6A 5W9
Ontario
Date Received: 30 May 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Biochemistry |
Effective:14 Dec 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1978 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1979 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 1989 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2022 |