THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 15:09:33 PM
Tabah, Roger John
CPSO#:
43586
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jul 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jul 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
MUHC - Cedars Cancer Center
Room D.02.7324
1001 Decarie
Montreal QC H3G 3J1
Phone: (514) 932-4224
Fax: (514) 9387695
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:18 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROGER JOHN TABAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TABAH is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1980 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1981 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 1992 |