THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 18:58:30 PM
Wood, Lorraine Emily
CPSO#:
43568
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
16 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 May 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Lorraine Wood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 13 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Mount Sinai Hospital, The Temmy Latner Center for Palliative Care, 600 University Avenue, Toronto, ON M5G 1X5
Date Received: 15 Jun 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Jun 2005 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1980 to 15 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1979 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 1981 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Oct 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 May 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 May 2006 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 16 Jun 2015 |