THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:27:11 AM
Prokopetz, Robert Donald
CPSO#:
43545
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Oct 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Oct 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Gamma Dynacare Laboratory
750 Peter Morand Crescent
Ottawa ON K1G 6S4
Phone: (613) 729-0200 Ext. 6602
Fax: (613) 249-0664
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Brunswick
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:13 Dec 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Dermatology |
Effective:19 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT DONALD PROKOPETZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PROKOPETZ is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1981 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 1990 |