THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 16:19:52 PM
Knight, Burton Walter
CPSO#:
43450
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Aug 1994
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Aug 1994
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
314-1333 Sheppard Ave E
North York ON M2J 1V1
Phone: 4164981998
Fax: 4164984518
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:04 Sep 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:11 Jun 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BURTON WALTER KNIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNIGHT is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1980 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 1994 |