THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 11:55:50 AM
White, Ian William Craig
CPSO#:
43371
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Mar 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Ian White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 10 2007
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:24 Nov 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 1981 to 31 Dec 1981
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1981 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1981 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Mar 2004 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2007 |