THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 13:06:42 PM
Bates, Robert Blair
CPSO#:
43331
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jul 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
American Sign Language, English
Education: University of Toronto, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Bates Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 26 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking access to a copy of their medical record can contact DocuDavit Solutions:
Telephone 1-888-781-9083,
Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 28 Mar 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1981 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Jun 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Apr 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |