THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 2:42:51 AM
Avruch, Leonard Israel
CPSO#:
43313
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
14 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Oct 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Trudy M. Hall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 27 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:OTTAWA GENERAL HOSPITAL
501 SMYTH ROAD
OTTAWA, ONTARIO
K1H 8L6
Date Received: 14 Jul 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:25 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1981 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 Jul 2020 |