THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 9:20:25 AM
Adams, Paul Clifford
CPSO#:
43214
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jan 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Oct 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Paul Clifford Adams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 3 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:20 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1980 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Oct 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jan 2021 |