THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 22:32:20 PM
Verma, Narpendra
CPSO#:
43199
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
23 May 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Jul 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Guru Nanak Dev University, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. N. Verma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 14 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saskatchewan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1978 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Sep 2005 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 08 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Nov 2009 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 23 May 2018 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: May 23, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Narpendra Verma to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 23, 2018:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Verma failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Verma resigned from the College and other jurisdictions in which he was entitled to practice medicine and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.