THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 18:39:15 PM
Schulman, Sam
CPSO#:
43196
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Sep 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Academic Practice
as of
10 Sep 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Hebrew, Swedish
Education: Karolinska Medico-Kirurgiska Institute, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Thrombosis Service
HHS - General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-0271 Ext. 44479
Fax: (905) 521-1551
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel
Sweden
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Sep 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:01 Sep 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAM SCHULMAN may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the MCMASTER UNIVERSITY in which Dr. SCHULMAN holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. SCHULMAN may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. SCHULMAN no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. SCHULMAN no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. SCHULMAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1981 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 2004 |