THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 23:11:16 PM
Okafo, Benjamin Anisiobi
CPSO#:
43172
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
17 Aug 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Dec 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:17 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Apr 1989
CF - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 1981 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 1988 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Dec 2000 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 17 Aug 2020 |