THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 10:22:22 AM
Madden, Joseph Kieran
CPSO#:
43154
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Nov 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Nov 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
50 College Dr
North Bay Regional Health Centre
Child and Adolescent Mental Health
North Bay ON P1B 0A4
Phone: 705-474-8600 Ext. 4250
Fax: 705-495-7575
Electoral District: 08
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph K. Madden Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2024
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kirkland and District Hospital |
Kirkland Lake |
North Bay Regional Health Centre |
North Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:12 Jun 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOSEPH KIERAN MADDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MADDEN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1981 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 May 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Nov 1986 |