THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 3:27:36 AM
McDonald, John Christopher
CPSO#:
43069
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Oct 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Oct 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the West Indies, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Dr
Peterborough ON K9J 7C3
Phone: (705) 743-2040
Fax: (705) 740-6865
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:22 Nov 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN CHRISTOPHER MCDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDONALD is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 1977 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1981 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2022 |