THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 14:33:23 PM
Labonte, Roger Edmond
CPSO#:
43029
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Aug 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Aug 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
1500 Paris Street
Sudbury ON P3E 3B8
Phone: (705) 522-7346
Fax: (705) 523-6806
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
West Nipissing General Hospital |
Sturgeon Falls |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:26 Jun 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:29 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROGER EDMOND LABONTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LABONTE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1981 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 1987 |