THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 19:38:51 PM
Rice, George Peter Arthur
CPSO#:
42844
MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of
13 Sep 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
20 Jan 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: George P.A. Rice Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 8 2007
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:04 Dec 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1977 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1981 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 1984 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 13 Aug 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Oct 2018 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Jan 2023 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee |
Effective: 20 Jan 2023 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee |
Effective: 13 Sep 2023 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: January 20, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. George Peter Arthur Rice to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 20, 2023:
Further to the receipt of two public complaints, College investigations were conducted into whether Dr. Rice engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in his neurology practice. As a result of the investigations:
Dr. Rice will engage in professional education in professionalism, documentation, Parkinson Disease, boundaries and the protection of personal health information, and medical record keeping.