THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 2:29:21 AM
Duff, Susie
CPSO#:
42816
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
06 May 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Jan 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
713 Montreal Rd
CF Health Services Center,
Montfort Hospital
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Phone: 613-945-1551
Fax: 613-945-1555
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Susie Duff Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 6 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:18 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:03 Dec 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 1981 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Jul 1981 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1984 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 1989 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 May 2021 |