THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:27:14 AM
Moens, Francois Oscar Pierre
CPSO#:
42814
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Jun 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Flemish, French
Education: Ghent University, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Moens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Juravinski Cancer Centre
at Hamilton Health Sciences
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON L8V 5C2
Date Received: 18 May 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:18 Nov 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1982 to 31 Dec 1982
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
CF - Gynecologic Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1979 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jan 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1989 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2017 |