THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 9:48:16 AM
Douglass, Alan Bruce
CPSO#:
42808
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Aug 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Aug 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Hospital
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 6226
Fax: (613) 798-2980
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:07 Jun 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALAN BRUCE DOUGLASS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUGLASS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1977 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 1982 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Dec 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Aug 2001 |