THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 23:00:11 PM
Acker, John Jacob
CPSO#:
42794
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jul 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jul 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4040 Finch Avenue East
Suite 301
Scarborough ON M1S 4V5
Phone: (416) 298-0111
Fax: (416) 298-1574
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: John J. Acker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:08 Jun 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:28 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN JACOB ACKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ACKER is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1977 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 1985 |