THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 6:46:31 AM
Yee, Chok Ching
CPSO#:
42743
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Mar 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English, Mandarin
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Chok Ching Yee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 24 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Docudavit
(416) 781-9083
www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 02 Jun 2017
Instructions/Address:DOCUdavit Medical Solutions, 1 (888)-781-9083, [email protected]
Date Received: 26 Aug 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 1969 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jun 1970 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 1984 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2017 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: March 9, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Chok Ching Yee to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective March 9, 2017:
Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Yee’s knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result, Dr. Yee has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.