THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 2:54:18 AM
Sidhu, Surinder Singh
CPSO#:
42712
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
16 Dec 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Mar 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Guru Nanak Dev University, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Surinder Singh Sidhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 18 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1981 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Mar 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 16 Dec 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: March 13, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
FINDINGS OF GUILT
Surinder Sidhu was found guilty of the following offence:
Having over 80 mg blood alcohol concentration within two hours after ceasing to operate a motor vehicle, contrary to s.320.14(1)(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
DATE: January 25, 2023
SENTENCE: Fine of $3000; 3 year driving prohibition
Source:
Other
Active Date: December 19, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
FINDINGS OF GUILT
Surinder Sidhu was found guilty of the following offence:
1. Having over 80 mg blood alcohol concentration within two hours after ceasing to operate a motor vehicle, contrary to s.320.14(1)(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
DATE: October 27, 2020
SENTENCE: Fine of $3000; 12 month driving prohibition; 12 month probation