THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 4:51:19 AM
Waind, Peter Bruce
CPSO#:
42666
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
18 Feb 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jun 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Waind Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 8 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
131 Union St E
Waterloo ON N2J 1C4
Date Received: 18 Feb 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:23 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1980 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1981 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 Feb 2020 |